Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Alberto Guimarães Rezende, C.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1926Born
8 Dec 195327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
9 Nov 198155.6AppointedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
6 Jan 198255.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
13 Nov 200276.6RetiredBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
13 Apr 201589.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Alberto Guimarães Rezende
Bishop Antônio Alberto Guimarães Rezende C.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caetité

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUberaba

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Apr 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017