Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lucas Cardinal Moreira Neves, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1925BornSão João del Rei
7 Mar 194519.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Jul 195024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Jun 196741.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Jun 196741.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
26 Aug 196741.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
7 Mar 197448.5AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
15 Oct 197954.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
15 Oct 197954.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Feradi Maius
3 Jan 198761.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Forum Novum
9 Jul 198761.8AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
28 Jun 198862.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198862.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
25 Jun 199872.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
25 Jun 199872.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto
24 Oct 199873.1InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto
16 Sep 200075.0RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Bishops
8 Sep 200277.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of the Congregation for Bishops

MicroData Summary for Lucas Moreira Neves:
Cardinal Lucas Moreira Neves O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
  • a cardinal for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 29 Sep 1998
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 24 Sep 2013