Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Migliore

Bishop of Coxim, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1946 BornSerradifalco
29 Jun 196923.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 200053.9AppointedPrelate of Coxim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
23 Jun 200054.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Coxim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
13 Nov 200256.4AppointedBishop of Coxim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antonino Migliore:
Bishop Antonino Migliore (born ) Bishop of Coxim

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Coxim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,790
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013