Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Maria Garsia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1928Born
1 Jul 195123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Siracusa e Ragusa, Italy
21 Dec 197345.9AppointedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
2 Feb 197446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
2 Aug 200375.5RetiredBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
4 Jun 200476.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Maria Garsia
Bishop Alfredo Maria Garsia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAugusta, Archdiocese of Siracusa
Ordained BishopAssunta, Augusta, Archdiocese of Siracusa

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast