Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cataldo Naro

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1951Born
29 Jun 197423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Caltanissetta, Italy
18 Oct 200251.7AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
14 Dec 200251.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
29 Sep 200655.7DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cataldo Naro
Archbishop Cataldo Naro (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Cataldo

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,293
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast