Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Minerva

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lecce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1904BornCanosa di Puglia
16 Apr 192723.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 194844.6AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
31 Oct 194844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
17 Dec 195046.9AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
20 Oct 198076.7AppointedArchbishop of Lecce, Italy
27 Jan 198177.0RetiredArchbishop of Lecce, Italy
23 Aug 2004100.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Minerva:
Archbishop Francesco Minerva (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lecce

  • a priest for 77.4 years
  • a bishop for 55.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1948, Number 121
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013