Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Massafra, O.F.M.

Archbishop of ShkodrŽ-Pult


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1949 BornSan Marzano di San Giuseppe, Italy
21 Sep 197425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Dec 199647.7AppointedBishop of RrŽshen, Albania
6 Jan 199747.8Ordained BishopBishop of RrŽshen, Albania
28 Mar 199849.0AppointedArchbishop of ShkodrŽ, Albania

MicroData Summary for Angelo Massafra:
Archbishop Angelo Massafra O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of ShkodrŽ-Pult

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ-Pult.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013