Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Vitale, R.C.J.

Bishop of LezhŰ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1959 Born
27 Jun 199233.3Ordained PriestPriest of Rogationists of the Heart of Jesus
5 Feb 200041.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of LezhŰ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
23 Nov 200546.7AppointedBishop of LezhŰ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
6 Jan 200646.9Ordained BishopBishop of LezhŰ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Vitale
Bishop Ottavio Vitale R.C.J. (born ) Bishop of LezhŰ {Lesh, Alessio}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrottaglie, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of LezhŰ {Lesh, Alessio}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,025
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018