Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benigno Luigi Papa, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1935 BornSpongano
25 Mar 196125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Sep 198146.0AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy
27 Dec 198146.3Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy
11 May 199054.7AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
21 Nov 201176.2RetiredArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
4 Apr 201680.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
7 Jan 201781.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benigno Luigi Papa
Archbishop Benigno Luigi Papa O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Taranto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Nov 2016