Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Maria Fragnelli

Bishop of Trapani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1952 Born
26 Jun 197725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Taranto, Italy
14 Feb 200350.9AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
29 Mar 200351.0Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
24 Sep 201361.5AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
3 Nov 201361.6InstalledBishop of Trapani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maria Fragnelli
Bishop Pietro Maria Fragnelli (born ) Bishop of Trapani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrispiano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trapani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,359
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2013
  • i: CB, 24 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast