Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Scarafile

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1927Born
23 Jul 195023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Monopoli, Italy
20 Dec 198053.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Conversano, Italy
20 Dec 198053.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
6 Jan 198153.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotaria
31 Oct 198558.3AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
14 Feb 200375.6RetiredBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
27 Dec 201184.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Martino Scarafile
Bishop Martino Scarafile (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCisternino
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 5,016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast