Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Luz

Dioecesis Luceatinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 5 December 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 32,976 (12,736 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Web Site: http://www.catedralnet.com.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 08, Rua Oito de Julho 153, 35595-000 Luz, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (037)421-1106
  • Fax: 421-1896

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Aterrado
18 July 1918ErectedArchdiocese of Mariana
Diocese of Uberaba
Diocese of Aterrado (erected)
11 July 1958Territory LostDiocese of Aterrado
Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte
Diocese of Divinópolis (erected)
Diocese of Luz
5 December 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Aterrado Diocese of Luz

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Aterrado
1950262,000390,00067.2%201001202,18332ap1951
1957372,530.0%28144202ap1960
Diocese of Luz
1965456,260460,00099.2%28174510,139199139ap1967
1970463,329.0%2222011231ap1971
1976396,410404,50098.0%1834527,623408530ap1977
1980415,000435,00095.4%2126478,829317434ap1981
1990430,000460,00093.5%3126577,543523240ap1991
1999343,400425,20080.8%3418526,603199232ap2000
2000344,350425,96080.8%3819576,041209237ap2001
2001398,000493,02380.7%3819576,982239239ap2002
2002344,350425,96080.8%3718556,260199232ap2003
2003352,000441,00079.8%5019695,101209237ap2004
2004352,800441,00080.0%3820586,082204034ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 6 Mar 2014