Bishop(s)
Suffragan Dioceses
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Uberaba | |||
29 September 1907 | Erected | Diocese of Goiás | Diocese of Uberaba (erected) |
18 July 1918 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Mariana
Diocese of Uberaba | Diocese of Aterrado (erected) |
1 March 1929 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Montes Claros
Diocese of Uberaba | Territorial Prelature of Paracatu (erected) (Paracatu, João Pinheiro, and Sâo Româo (except Afonso Arinos)) |
5 April 1955 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Uberaba (S. Antonio de Patos, N.S. do Rosario de Patos, Araxá, Coromandel, Ibiá, Pratinha, Lagoa Formosa, Sant'Ana de Patos, Presidente Olegario, Patrocinio, Serra do Salitre, Abadia dos Dourados, Monte Carmelo, Perdizes, Carmo do Paranaiba, Desemboque, and ...) | Diocese of Patos de Minas (erected) |
22 July 1961 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Uberaba (Cities of Uberlândia, Araguarí, Canápolis, Capinópolis, Cascalho Rico, Centralina, Estrêla do Sul, Indianópolis, Ituiutaba, Monte Alegre de Minas, Santa Vitoria, and Tupaciguara) | Diocese of Uberlândia (erected) |
Archdiocese of Uberaba | |||
14 April 1962 | Elevated | Diocese of Uberaba | Archdiocese of Uberaba |
16 October 1982 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Uberaba (Cities of Campina Verde, Itapagipe, Iturama, and Sao Francisco de Sales)
Diocese of Uberlândia (Cities of Ituiutaba, Cachoeira Bourada, Canapolis, Centralina, Curinhata, Ipiaçu, and Santa Vitoria) | Diocese of Ituiutaba (erected) |
10 November 1982 | Territory Added | Diocese of Luz (Desemboque, Sacramento) | Archdiocese of Uberaba |
9 November 2002 | Territory Added | Diocese of Patos de Minas (Araxá) | Archdiocese of Uberaba |
10 January 2004 | Territory Added | Diocese of Luz (São Sebastião in Tapira) | Archdiocese of Uberaba |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Uberaba | ||||||||||||
1948 | 635,000 | 660,000 | 96.2% | 33 | 73 | 106 | 5,990 | 86 | 270 | 42 | ap1951 | |
Archdiocese of Uberaba | ||||||||||||
1961 | 220,000 | .0% | 23 | 16 | 39 | 0 | 17 | ap1967 | ||||
1970 | 340,000 | .0% | 22 | 32 | 54 | 0 | 38 | 227 | 21 | ap1971 | ||
1973 | 281,055 | 330,653 | 85.0% | 19 | 41 | 60 | 4,684 | 49 | 218 | 26 | ap1977 | |
1980 | 379,000 | 423,000 | 89.6% | 20 | 39 | 59 | 6,423 | 56 | 160 | 31 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 363,000 | 401,000 | 90.5% | 26 | 24 | 50 | 7,260 | 33 | 145 | 32 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 343,135 | 527,930 | 65.0% | 37 | 18 | 55 | 6,238 | 28 | 160 | 40 | ap2000 | |
2000 | 378,868 | 597,837 | 63.4% | 42 | 26 | 68 | 5,571 | 26 | 85 | 40 | ap2001 | |
2001 | 377,470 | 568,967 | 66.3% | 42 | 26 | 68 | 5,551 | 45 | 143 | 41 | ap2002 | |
2002 | 483,565 | 585,641 | 82.6% | 54 | 20 | 74 | 6,534 | 25 | 55 | 40 | ap2003 | |
2003 | 442,787 | 692,184 | 64.0% | 58 | 13 | 71 | 6,236 | 1 | 21 | 136 | 46 | ap2004 |
2004 | 444,081 | 693,185 | 64.1% | 62 | 13 | 75 | 5,921 | 1 | 26 | 121 | 47 | ap2005 |
2010 | 539,000 | 746,000 | 72.3% | 65 | 13 | 78 | 6,910 | 21 | 35 | 146 | 53 | ap2011 |
2014 | 565,000 | 782,000 | 72.3% | 66 | 11 | 77 | 7,337 | 21 | 26 | 222 | 59 | ap2015 |
2017 | 580,000 | 724,000 | 80.1% | 68 | 16 | 84 | 6,904 | 44 | 33 | 80 | 60 | ap2018 |
2020 | 452,645 | 694,118 | 65.2% | 63 | 15 | 78 | 5,803 | 44 | 27 | 123 | 61 | ap2021 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 15 Nov 2023 |
✠