Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sobral

Dioecesis Sobralensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 November 1915
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Fortaleza
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Ceara
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 18,920 (7,307 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste I
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Prace Quirino Rodrigues 76/4, 62011-260 Sobral, CE, Brazil
  • Telephone: (088)3611-0545
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 November 1915ErectedDiocese of Fortaleza (Ceará) Diocese of Sobral (erected)
28 September 1963Territory LostDiocese of Iguatú
Diocese of Sobral
Diocese of Crateús (erected)
13 March 1971Territory LostDiocese of Sobral Diocese of Tianguá (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
19501,000,0001,140,00087.7%5365916,94964031ap1951
1965800,000800,000100.0%62107211,1112621532ap1967
1970750,000800,00093.8%5175812,9311132ap1971
1976533,900536,96699.4%3423614,830412521ap1977
1980496,000606,00081.8%3223414,588216221ap1981
1990670,000685,00097.8%3924116,34138923ap1991
1998712,344818,29387.1%4034316,56649126ap2001
1999712,344818,29387.1%4034316,56649126ap2000
2001723,856843,00485.9%4164715,4011610028ap2002
2002719,467826,47587.1%3844217,130129226ap2003
2003719,481863,71383.3%4465014,3891010426ap2004
2004731,554863,71384.7%4865413,5471511026ap2005
2010777,000917,00084.7%5746112,7371510237ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 8 Dec 2014