Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antônio Fontinele de Melo

Bishop-Elect of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1968 Born
21 Nov 199830.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
18 Sep 199931.3Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
12 Aug 202052.2AppointedBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
17 Oct 202052.4Ordained BishopBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Fontinele de Melo
Father Antônio Fontinele de Melo (born ) Bishop-Elect of Humaitá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamocim, Diocese of Sobral, Ceara
Ordained BishopHumaitá, Diocese of Humaitá, Amazonas

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Humaitá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Aug 2020
  • od: CB, 12 Aug 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 Aug 2020
  • c2+: CB, 25 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast