Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquim Domingues de Oliveira

Deceased

Archbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1878BornVillanova de Gaia, Portugal
21 Dec 190123.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 191435.3AppointedBishop of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina), Brazil
31 May 191435.5Ordained BishopBishop of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina), Brazil
17 Jan 192748.1AppointedArchbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
18 May 196788.5DiedArchbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Domingues de Oliveira:
Archbishop Joaquim Domingues de Oliveira (born , died ) Archbishop of Florianópolis

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 53.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013