Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Henrique Hostin, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1890Born
30 Nov 191727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Aug 192939.3AppointedBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
29 Sep 192939.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
17 Nov 197383.6DiedBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Daniel Henrique Hostin
Bishop Daniel Henrique Hostin O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Lages

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaspar

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018