Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Stanislaus Schmitt, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1919Born
11 Jul 193819.4EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jul 193920.4Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jul 194223.4Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Nov 194223.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
28 Nov 194324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Aug 196041.5AppointedBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
28 Oct 196041.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
8 Jan 196141.9InstalledBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
14 Feb 197051.0ResignedBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
14 Feb 197051.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufar
5 Apr 197051.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
16 Mar 197152.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Sufar
20 Feb 197354.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
16 Jan 200686.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Stanislaus Schmitt
Bishop Carlos Stanislaus Schmitt O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dourados

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaspar
Ordained DeaconPetrópolis, Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy)
Ordained PriestPetrópolis, Diocese of Niterói (Nictheroy)
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSanta Isabel, Hospital, Blumenau, Diocese of Blumenau, Santa Catarina

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jul 2021

Quantcast