Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Pereira Alves

Deceased

Bishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1885Born
17 Nov 190722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Olinda, Brazil
27 Oct 192237.6AppointedBishop of Natal, Brazil
4 Mar 192337.9Ordained BishopBishop of Natal, Brazil
27 Jan 192842.8AppointedBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil
20 May 192843.2InstalledBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil
21 Dec 1947³62.7DiedBishop of Niterói (Nictheroy), Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary
José Pereira Alves
Bishop José Pereira Alves
(born , died )
Bishop of Niterói (Nictheroy)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalmares

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025