Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jerónimo Tomé da Silva

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1849Born
25 May 187222.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olinda, Brazil
21 Dec 187223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olinda, Brazil
26 Jun 189041.0AppointedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
26 Oct 189041.3Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
12 Sep 189344.2AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
28 Feb 189444.7InstalledArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
19 Feb 192474.6DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Tomé da Silva (VIAF: 98886993)
Archbishop Jerónimo Tomé da Silva (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSobral, Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará)
Ordained BishopCollege Pio Latino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 144, and Page 495
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017