Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio de Macedo Costa

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1830Born
6 Jun 185726.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 185727.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 186030.1SelectedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
17 Dec 186030.3ConfirmedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
21 Apr 186130.7Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
28 May 186130.8InstalledBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
26 Jun 189059.8AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
20 Mar 189160.6DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio de Macedo Costa (VIAF: 100017302)
Archbishop Antônio de Macedo Costa (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaragogipe, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
Ordained BishopPetropolis, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 144, and Page 495
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017