Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquim Gonçalves de Azevedo

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1814Born
8 Apr 183723.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 186551.5AppointedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
1 Jul 186652.3Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Brazil
30 Aug 187662.5SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
18 Dec 187662.8ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
6 Nov 187965.7DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Gonçalves de Azevedo
Archbishop Joaquim Gonçalves de Azevedo (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Francisco Xavier de Turiaçu, Diocese of Belém do Pará
Ordained BishopBelém do Pará, Diocese of Belém do Pará

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 288, and Page 495
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017