Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Luiz d’Amour

Deceased

Archbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1836Born
30 Nov 186024.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 187740.8SelectedBishop of Cuiabá, Brazil
21 Sep 187741.2ConfirmedBishop of Cuiabá, Brazil
28 Apr 187841.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cuiabá, Brazil
5 Apr 191073.8AppointedArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
9 Jul 192185.0DiedArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Luiz d’Amour (VIAF: 48068736)
Archbishop Carlos Luiz d’Amour (born , died ) Archbishop of Cuiabá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaranhão, Diocese of São Luís do Maranhão
Ordained BishopSão Salvador, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017