Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Belém do Pará

Archidioecesis Belemensis de Pará



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alberto Taveira Corrêa, Archbishop
  • Teodoro Mendes Tavares, C.S.Sp., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Irineu Roman, C.S.I., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Vicente Joaquim Zico, C.M., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 May 1906
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Para
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 2,082 (804 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte II
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesedebelem.com.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Avda. Governador Jose Malcher 915, 66055-260 Belem, PA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (091)3215-7001
  • Fax: 3219-1146

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Belém do Pará
4 March 1720ErectedDiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Diocese of Belém do Pará (erected)
27 April 1892Territory LostDiocese of Belém do Pará Diocese of Amazonas (erected)
21 September 1903Territory LostDiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Santarém (erected)
Archdiocese of Belém do Pará
1 May 1906ElevatedDiocese of Belém do Pará Archdiocese of Belém do Pará
18 July 1911Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia (erected)
14 April 1928Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Gurupi (erected)
14 April 1928Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Marajó (erected)
16 August 1934Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia
Territorial Prelature of Santarém
Territorial Prelature of Xingu (erected)
29 November 1952Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Cametá (erected)
25 November 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Abaeté do Tocantins (erected)
25 June 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Ponta de Pedras (erected)
29 December 2004Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará
Diocese of Bragança do Pará
Diocese of Castanhal (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Belém do Pará
1949990,0001,000,00099.0%21638411,78527948ap1951
1958689,200719,28395.8%3550858,1087342041ap1960
1965720,000780,92092.2%40691096,6059843436ap1967
1970780,000813,41895.9%32871196,554212044742ap1971
19761,002,6211,234,56781.2%39891287,832211941250ap1977
19771,110,0001,238,00089.7%40761169,56899934852ap1981
19901,526,0001,823,00083.7%657514010,9004711545061ap1991
19992,000,0002,500,00080.0%511572089,6155024943875ap2000
20002,000,0002,500,00080.0%637814114,1845516149877ap2001
20012,030,0002,500,00081.2%699916812,0835615450880ap2002
20022,058,0002,535,00081.2%6810116912,1775516951080ap2003
20032,091,2812,734,84276.5%6910317212,1585317944583ap2004
20042,119,5582,712,54278.1%6710517212,3236018344183ap2005
20051,704,0002,068,83682.4%488613412,71616232852bul:29Dec2004
20061,503,3022,042,53073.6%468613211,3885016039154ap2007
20121,544,0002,125,00072.7%105891947,9588415536373ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014