Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Marabá

Dioecesis Marabensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vital Corbellini, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Belém do Pará
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Para
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 81,832 (31,607 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte II
  • Web Site: http://www.diocesedemarilia.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 215, Trav. 13 de Maio 208, 68501-000 Maraba, PA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (091) 321-1339
  • Fax: 324-2143

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia
18 July 1911ErectedArchdiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia (erected)
16 August 1934Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia
Territorial Prelature of Santarém
Territorial Prelature of Xingu (erected)
13 May 1969Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Cristalândia
Territorial Prelature of Registro do Araguaia
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia
Territorial Prelature of São Félix (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Marabá
20 December 1969Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia Territorial Prelature of Marabá
27 March 1976Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Cristalândia
Territorial Prelature of Marabá
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia (erected)
Diocese of Marabá
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Marabá Diocese of Marabá

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia
195015,00020,00075.0%1453,0005132ap1951
196637,00045,00082.2%75123,0837423ap1967
Territorial Prelature of Marabá
197043,000.0%641004232ap1971
1976160,000180,00088.9%681411,42893510ap1977
Diocese of Marabá
197773,00086,00084.9%3589,1256207ap1981
1990452,000473,00095.6%3161923,789116458ap1991
1999500,000650,00076.9%7152222,72716408ap2000
2000500,000650,00076.9%7162321,73919399ap2001
2001300,000501,43559.8%6131915,789182511ap2002
2002302,000505,00059.8%8132114,380172314ap2003
2003370,000533,00069.4%8162415,416362418ap2004
2004370,000533,00069.4%11162713,703362418ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 May 2014