Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cristalândia

Dioecesis Cristalandiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 July 2019
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Palmas
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Goias
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 62,691 (24,214 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro-Oeste
  • Mailing Address: Curia Prelaticia, Praca da Catedral s/n, 77490-000 Cristalandia, TO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (063)3354-1308
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Cristalândia
26 March 1956ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Cristalândia (erected)
13 May 1969Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Cristalândia
Territorial Prelature of Registro do Araguaia
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia
Territorial Prelature of São Félix (erected)
27 March 1976Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Cristalândia
Territorial Prelature of Marabá
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia (erected)
Diocese of Cristalândia
10 July 2019ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Cristalândia Diocese of Cristalândia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Cristalândia
196678,00080,00097.5%12126,50014145ap1967
197090,000.0%51116014125ap1971
197690,10095,00094.8%112136,93018186ap1977
1980135,851150,85190.1%2101211,32012175ap1981
1990177,000195,00090.8%591412,642113517ap1991
1999206,000229,00090.0%491315,84611387ap2000
2000207,000232,00089.2%591414,7859388ap2001
2001315,000350,00090.0%8101817,50011418ap2002
2004153,600192,00080.0%1010207,680115476ap2005
2013172,400214,70080.3%165218,209172517ap2014
2016176,700221,00080.0%164208,835152017ap2017
Diocese of Cristalândia
2019138,750245,02056.6%192216,60722317bul:10Jul2019

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.9, 9 Jun 2019; Data: 10 Jul 2019

Quantcast