Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rodolfo Luís Weber

Archbishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1963 Born
5 Jan 199127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
25 Feb 200945.4AppointedPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
15 May 200945.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
2 Dec 201552.2AppointedArchbishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
24 Jan 201652.4InstalledArchbishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Luís Weber
Archbishop Rodolfo Luís Weber (born ) Archbishop of Passo Fundo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBom Princípio

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Passo Fundo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,172
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2015
  • i: CB, 8 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018