Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Vaquero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1914BornPirassununga
12 Dec 194127.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 196349.3AppointedBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Aug 196349.4Ordained BishopBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Jan 199176.8RetiredBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Aug 199278.4DiedBishop Emeritus of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tomás Vaquero:
Bishop Tomás Vaquero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São João da Boa Vista

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014