Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmilson Amador Caetano, O. Cist.

Bishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1960 Born
25 Mar 198221.9ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
7 Dec 198525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
9 Jan 200847.7AppointedBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Mar 200847.9Ordained BishopBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Apr 200848.0InstalledBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
29 Jan 201453.7AppointedBishop of Guarulhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edmilson Amador Caetano
Bishop Edmilson Amador Caetano O. Cist. (born ) Bishop of Guarulhos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guarulhos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,692
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Mar 2017