Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Aquino Pereira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1920BornAndrães
3 Dec 194424.6Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos do Pinhal, Brazil
23 Jan 195837.7AppointedBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
13 Apr 195837.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
26 May 195838.0InstalledBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
26 Mar 196039.9AppointedBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Jul 196040.1InstalledBishop of Presidente Prudente, Sao Paulo, Brazil
6 May 196848.0AppointedBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 Aug 196848.2InstalledBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Feb 199776.8RetiredBishop of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Nov 201191.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Aquino Pereira:
Bishop José de Aquino Pereira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rio Preto

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 53.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • d: CB, 17 Nov 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015