Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of São José do Rio Preto

Dioecesis Sancti Josephi Riopretensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 11 December 2002
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ribeirão Preto
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sao Paulo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 14,423 (5,570 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul I
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bispado.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Av. da Constituicao 1372, 15025-120, Sao Jose do Rio Preto, SP, Brazil
  • Telephone: (017)2136-8699
  • Fax: 2136-8694

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Rio Preto
25 January 1929ErectedDiocese of São Carlos do Pinhal Diocese of Rio Preto (erected)
12 December 1959Territory LostDiocese of Rio Preto Diocese of Jales (erected)
16 January 1960Territory LostDiocese of Rio Preto Diocese of São João da Boa Vista (erected)
20 February 1971Territory LostDiocese of Rio Preto Diocese of Franca (erected)
14 April 1973Territory LostDiocese of Jaboticabal
Diocese of Rio Preto
Diocese of Barretos (erected)
9 February 2000Territory LostDiocese of Jaboticabal
Diocese of Rio Preto
Diocese of São Carlos
Diocese of Catanduva (erected)
Diocese of São José do Rio Preto
11 December 2002Name ChangedDiocese of Rio Preto Diocese of São José do Rio Preto

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Rio Preto
1948600,000610,00098.4%27204712,765246941ap1951
1966900,0001,000,00090.0%28447212,5005014941ap1967
1970613,886.0%274370014942ap1971
1976417,000556,90074.9%4935844,9644313353ap1977
1980499,100659,00075.7%4328717,0293512757ap1981
1990666,000687,00096.9%6923927,2392410173ap1991
1999740,000932,60079.3%93151086,851199683ap2000
2000682,000858,00079.5%91151066,433199683ap2001
2001662,604788,81584.0%87251125,916308985ap2002
2002760,081904,81684.0%88271156,6091398985ap2003
Diocese of São José do Rio Preto
2003765,492959,74379.8%88261146,7141388789ap2004
2004637,844850,45875.0%97221195,3601487689ap2005
2010685,000913,00075.0%98341325,18917778593ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014