Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Emídio Vilar, S.D.B.

Archbishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1957 Born
31 Jan 197618.2ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Aug 198628.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Jul 200850.6AppointedBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
27 Sep 200850.8Ordained BishopBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
25 Oct 200850.9InstalledBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
28 Sep 201658.8AppointedBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Nov 201659.0InstalledBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Jan 202264.1AppointedBishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Mar 202264.3InstalledBishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 May 202567.5AppointedArchbishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary
Antônio Emídio Vilar
Archbishop Antônio Emídio Vilar S.D.B.
(born )
Archbishop of São José do Rio Preto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuardinha, Diocese of Guaxupé, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora Auxiliadora, Church, Bom Retiro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of São José do Rio Preto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,963
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2016
  • i: CB, 20 Nov 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2022
  • i: CB, 19 Jan 2022
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 22 May 2025