Bishop(s)
Suffragan Dioceses
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará) | |||
6 June 1854 | Erected | Diocese of Olinda | Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará) (erected) |
20 October 1914 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará) | Diocese of Crato (erected) |
10 November 1915 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará) | Diocese of Sobral (erected) |
Archdiocese of Fortaleza | |||
10 November 1915 | Elevated | Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará) | Archdiocese of Fortaleza |
7 May 1938 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Fortaleza (Limoeiro, Aracati, Areìas, Jaguario e Mirini, Morada Nova, Pereiro, Riacho do Sangue, São Bernardo das Russas, and União) | Diocese of Limoeiro do Norte (erected) |
28 January 1961 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Crato (Acopiara, Arneiroz, Aiuaba, Cariús, Catarina, Cedro, Cococí, Ico, Iguatú, Jucas, Oros, Parambú, Saboeiro, and Tauá)
Archdiocese of Fortaleza (Milha, Mombaça, Pedra Branca, Piquet Carneiro, Senador Pompeu, and Solonópole) | Diocese of Iguatu (erected) |
13 March 1971 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Fortaleza (Apuiarés, General Sampaio, Irauçaba, Itapagé, Itapipoca, Paracuru, Pentecoste, Sao Luís do Cura, Trairi, and Uruburetama)
Diocese of Sobral (Itarema of Acaran) | Diocese of Itapipoca (erected) |
13 March 1971 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Fortaleza (Boa Viagem, Capistrano, Itapiúna, Itatira, Quixadá, and Quixeramobi) | Diocese of Quixadá (erected) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Archdiocese of Fortaleza | ||||||||||||
1949 | 1,050,000 | 1,200,000 | 87.5% | 87 | 100 | 187 | 5,614 | 200 | 385 | 51 | ap1951 | |
1961 | 1,610,770 | 1,789,745 | 90.0% | 120 | 131 | 251 | 6,417 | 160 | 350 | 73 | ap1967 | |
1970 | 1,635,476 | 1,919,343 | 85.2% | 110 | 126 | 236 | 6,929 | 141 | 1,038 | 71 | ap1971 | |
1976 | 1,400,000 | 1,610,400 | 86.9% | 97 | 77 | 174 | 8,045 | 106 | 690 | 62 | ap1977 | |
1980 | 1,500,660 | 1,705,330 | 88.0% | 100 | 117 | 217 | 6,915 | 149 | 845 | 61 | ap1981* | |
1990 | 1,981,000 | 2,328,000 | 85.1% | 110 | 110 | 220 | 9,004 | 162 | 1,349 | 68 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 2,200,000 | 3,500,000 | 62.9% | 135 | 130 | 265 | 8,301 | 226 | 2,215 | 76 | ap2000 | |
2000 | 2,200,000 | 3,500,700 | 62.8% | 144 | 140 | 284 | 7,746 | 251 | 2,215 | 73 | ap2001 | |
2001 | 2,360,574 | 3,233,664 | 73.0% | 138 | 140 | 278 | 8,491 | 251 | 2,215 | 78 | ap2002 | |
2002 | 2,100,000 | 3,263,518 | 64.3% | 137 | 156 | 293 | 7,167 | 300 | 871 | 78 | ap2003 | |
2003 | 2,316,774 | 3,273,975 | 70.8% | 130 | 146 | 276 | 8,394 | 281 | 871 | 80 | ap2004 | |
2004 | 2,406,000 | 3,400,657 | 70.8% | 145 | 146 | 291 | 8,268 | 281 | 871 | 85 | ap2005 | |
2006 | 2,466,000 | 3,487,000 | 70.7% | 157 | 146 | 303 | 8,138 | 281 | 871 | 90 | ap2007 | |
2013 | 2,630,000 | 3,719,000 | 70.7% | 204 | 191 | 395 | 6,658 | 21 | 311 | 373 | 115 | ap2014 |
2016 | 2,696,000 | 3,812,000 | 70.7% | 260 | 184 | 444 | 6,072 | 22 | 303 | 373 | 126 | ap2017 |
2019 | 2,764,754 | 3,975,543 | 69.5% | 239 | 207 | 446 | 6,199 | 27 | 341 | 572 | 137 | ap2020 |
2021 | 2,796,217 | 4,455,648 | 62.8% | 191 | 216 | 407 | 6,870 | 19 | 363 | 644 | 138 | ap2022 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 17 Oct 2023 |
✠