Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Xisto Albano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Bethsaida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1859Born
30 May 188525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fortaleza (Ceará), Brazil
23 Mar 190141.6AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
16 Jun 190141.8Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
14 Dec 190546.3ResignedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
14 Dec 190546.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
22 Feb 191757.5DiedBishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Xisto Albano
Archbishop Antônio Xisto Albano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFortaleza

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018