Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel de Monte Rodrigues de Araújo

Deceased

Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1797BornRecife
10 Feb 182224.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Feb 182224.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 183942.2SelectedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
23 Dec 183942.8ConfirmedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 May 184043.2Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 Jun 186366.2DiedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel de Monte Rodrigues de Araújo:
Bishop Manoel de Monte Rodrigues de Araújo (born , died ) Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013