Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Affonso de Moraes Torres, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1805BornRio de Janeiro
29 Feb 182823.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
1 Mar 182823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
14 Jul 184338.5SelectedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
22 Jan 184439.0ConfirmedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
21 Apr 184439.2Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
24 Sep 185752.7ResignedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
19 Nov 186560.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Affonso de Moraes Torres:
Bishop José Affonso de Moraes Torres C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013