Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Joaquim de Mello

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1791Born
10 Oct 181322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of São Paulo, Brazil
23 Oct 181423.0Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
15 Mar 185260.4AppointedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
6 Jun 185260.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
14 Jun 185260.7InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
16 Feb 186169.3DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Joaquim de Mello (VIAF: 11431638)
Bishop Antônio Joaquim de Mello (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItú, Diocese of São Paulo
Ordained BishopAjuda, Church, Rio de Janeiro, Diocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro
Death PlaceItú, Diocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 444
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,751

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Sep 2020

Quantcast