Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliciano José Rodrigues de Araujo Prates (de Castilhos)

Deceased

Bishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1781BornNossa Senhora dos Anjos da Aldeia
25 Jul 180423.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 185270.7SelectedBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Sep 185271.2ConfirmedBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
29 May 185371.8Ordained BishopBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Jul 185371.9InstalledBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 May 185876.8DiedBishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Feliciano José Rodrigues de Araujo Prates (de Castilhos) (VIAF: 38445621)
Bishop Feliciano José Rodrigues de Araujo Prates (de Castilhos) (born , died ) Bishop of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 450
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016