Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santino Maria da Silva Coutinho

Deceased

Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1868BornPilôes
19 Dec 189123.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 190637.7AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
6 Dec 190638.0AppointedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
19 Mar 190738.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
19 Jan 192354.1AppointedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
10 Jan 193970.1DiedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Santino Maria da Silva Coutinho:
Archbishop Santino Maria da Silva Coutinho (born , died ) Archbishop of Maceió

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013