Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Maceió

Archidioecesis Maceiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antônio Muniz Fernandes, O. Carm., Archbishop
  • Edvaldo Gonçalves Amaral, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus
  • José Carlos Melo, C.M., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 February 1920
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Alagoas
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 8,545 (3,300 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste II
  • Mailing Address: Av. D. Antonio Brandao 559, 57020-630 Maceio, AL, Brazil
  • Telephone: (082) 223-2732
  • Fax: 221-6588

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Alagôas
2 July 1900ErectedDiocese of Olinda Diocese of Alagôas (erected)
3 April 1916Territory LostDiocese of Alagôas Diocese of Penedo (erected)
Diocese of Maceió
25 August 1917Name ChangedDiocese of Alagôas Diocese of Maceió
Archdiocese of Maceió
13 February 1920ElevatedDiocese of Maceió Archdiocese of Maceió
10 February 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Maceió
Diocese of Penedo
Diocese of Palmeira dos Índios (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Maceió
1950620,000623,75699.4%45166110,163369028ap1951
1966697,664700,00099.7%32185013,9531819629ap1967
1967687,347700,00098.2%33205312,9681821629ap1971
1976810,000830,00097.6%29154418,40962418631ap1977
1980848,000953,00089.0%31195016,96063320333ap1981
1990854,0001,220,00070.0%37165316,11363225843ap1991
19991,180,0001,680,22070.2%71219212,826284922050ap2000
20001,200,0001,600,00075.0%62188015,000284520550ap2001
20011,200,0001,600,00075.0%63188114,814284520550ap2002
20021,279,0001,705,00075.0%62188015,987244520550ap2003
2003944,1001,452,47665.0%44186215,227244520542ap2004

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014