Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edvaldo Gonçalves Amaral, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1927 Born
8 Dec 195427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Feb 197547.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
15 Feb 197547.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zallata
20 Apr 197547.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zallata
2 Sep 198053.2AppointedBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
24 Oct 198558.4AppointedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
3 Jul 200275.1RetiredArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edvaldo Gonçalves Amaral
Archbishop Edvaldo Gonçalves Amaral S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maceió

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecife
Ordained BishopGymnasium, Natal, Archdiocese of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maceió.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,718

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Sep 2020

Quantcast