Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Natal

Archidioecesis Natalensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jaime Vieira Rocha, Archbishop
  • Heitor de Araújo Sales, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Matias Patrício de Macêdo, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 16 February 1952
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio Grande do Norte
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 25,153 (9,715 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste II
  • Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesedenatal.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Av. Floriano Peixoto 1060, C.P. 227, 59020-500 Natal, RN, Brazil
  • Telephone: (084) 211-8418
  • Fax: 211-4787

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Natal
29 December 1909ErectedDiocese of Paraíba Diocese of Natal (erected)
28 July 1934Territory LostDiocese of Natal Diocese of Mossoró (erected)
25 November 1939Territory LostDiocese of Natal Diocese of Caicó (erected)
Archdiocese of Natal
16 February 1952ErectedDiocese of Natal Archdiocese of Natal (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Natal
1965700,00043226510,769349ap1967
196845176202719926ap1971
1976906,321946,22195.8%49146314,3861921539ap1977
19801,192,0001,257,00094.8%39135222,9232224540ap1981
19901,280,0001,440,00088.9%45166120,9833026548ap1991
19991,488,0001,671,00089.0%73148717,10332224555ap2000
20001,200,0001,539,60877.9%861710311,650132524556ap2001
20011,424,5181,826,30578.0%81189914,389133124857ap2002
20021,965,8342,520,30078.0%831710019,658192821961ap2003
20031,282,9601,832,79370.0%982111910,781203239264ap2004
20041,627,5421,923,66784.6%982011813,792253729867ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013