Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Adelino Dantas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1910BornSão Vicente
18 Nov 193424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
10 Jun 195242.2AppointedBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
14 Sep 195242.5Ordained BishopBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
3 May 195848.1AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
20 Feb 196756.9AppointedBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
4 Oct 197565.5ResignedBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
24 Mar 198373.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Adelino Dantas:
Bishop José Adelino Dantas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa)

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014