Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elizeu Simões Mendes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campo Mourão, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1915BornFeira de Santana
4 Dec 193823.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 195035.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
21 Aug 195035.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisyrus
3 Dec 195035.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nisyrus
19 Sep 195338.3AppointedBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
17 Oct 195944.4AppointedBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
3 Dec 198065.5ResignedBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
2 Mar 200185.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Elizeu Simões Mendes:
Bishop Elizeu Simões Mendes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campo Mourão

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013