Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eugênio Cardinal de Araújo Sales

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Cardinal-Priest of San Gregorio VII


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1920BornAcarì
21 Nov 194323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Natal, Brazil
1 Jun 195433.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
1 Jun 195433.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibica
15 Aug 195433.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibica
9 Jan 196241.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
9 Jul 196443.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
29 Oct 196848.0AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
28 Apr 196948.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 196948.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gregorio VII
13 Mar 197150.3AppointedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
22 Jul 197251.7AppointedBishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
25 Jul 200180.7RetiredArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
3 Oct 200180.9RetiredBishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
9 Jul 201291.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eugênio de Araújo Sales:
Eugênio Cardinal de Araújo Sales (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 57.9 years
  • a cardinal for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 10 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Feb 2014