Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Alberto Etchandy Gimeno Navarro

Deceased

Archbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1931BornEngenho Novo
29 Jun 195927.7Ordained PriestPriest of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Oct 197544.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Oct 197544.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
12 Dec 197544.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae
29 Aug 198149.8AppointedBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
9 May 199058.5AppointedArchbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
2 Feb 200371.3DiedArchbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Etchandy Gimeno Navarro:
Archbishop Carlos Alberto Etchandy Gimeno Navarro (born , died ) Archbishop of Niterói

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 16 Oct 2014