Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Gomes Guimarães

Bishop Emeritus of Campos, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1936 BornCampos
8 Dec 196125.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 199559.9AppointedBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
7 Jan 199660.0Ordained BishopBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
8 Jun 201175.4RetiredBishop of Campos, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Roberto Gomes Guimarães:
Bishop Roberto Gomes Guimarães (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Campos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,654

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013