Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Moisés Sizenando Coelho

Deceased

Archbishop of Paraíba, Paraiba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1877BornCajazeiras
1 Nov 190124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
16 Nov 191437.6AppointedBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
2 May 191538.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
12 Feb 193254.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paraíba, Paraiba, Brazil
12 Feb 193254.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beroea
16 Aug 193558.4SucceededArchbishop of Paraíba, Paraiba, Brazil
18 Apr 195982.0DiedArchbishop of Paraíba, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Moisés Sizenando Coelho:
Archbishop Moisés Sizenando Coelho (born , died ) Archbishop of Paraíba

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013