Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Tomas Gomes da Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Aracajú, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1873Born
15 Nov 189623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Natal, Brazil
12 May 191137.7AppointedBishop of Aracajú, Brazil
19 Nov 191138.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aracajú, Brazil
4 Dec 191138.3InstalledBishop of Aracajú, Brazil
31 Oct 194875.2DiedBishop of Aracajú, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Tomas Gomes da Silva
Bishop José Tomas Gomes da Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Aracajú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartins

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 63
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast