Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Pesqueira

Dioecesis Pesqueirensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 2 August 1918
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Pernambuco
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 10,065 (3,887 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste II
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesedepesqueira.org/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 13, Rua Cardeal Arcoverde 23, 55200-000 Pesqueira, PE, Brazil
  • Telephone: (081) 3835-1526
  • Fax: 3835-2646

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Floresta
5 December 1910ErectedDiocese of Olinda Diocese of Floresta (erected)
Diocese of Pesqueira
2 August 1918Name ChangedDiocese of Floresta Diocese of Pesqueira
30 November 1923Territory LostDiocese of Pesqueira Diocese of Petrolina (erected)
2 July 1956Territory LostDiocese of Pesqueira Diocese of Afogados da Ingazeira (erected)
15 February 1964Territory LostDiocese of Pesqueira
Diocese of Petrópolis
Diocese of Floresta (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Pesqueira
1950392,000392,88799.8%3210429,333103625ap1951
1965266,000271,00098.2%1972610,23052516ap1967
1970301,000306,00098.4%171717,70517ap1971
1976303,000310,00097.7%1982711,222182819ap1977
1980325,000329,00098.8%14112513,0002123920ap1981
1990410,000428,00095.8%17102715,1855102721ap1991
1998465,000484,00096.1%22103214,5315103124ap2001
1999465,000484,00096.1%21103115,0005103124ap2000
2001470,000490,00095.9%3073712,702573724ap2002
2002446,000494,00090.3%2753213,937553325ap2003
2003370,200410,20090.2%375428,814553625ap2004
2004370,200410,20090.2%2743111,941543725ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013